Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 213 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 213 Week
» 26834 Month
» 26834 Year
» 1692210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4141 08/08/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 08911 06/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0808/08/1962
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 08/08/1962 to Carnforth (24L)
Withdrawn 01/05/2004
Time in Service 41 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
24L Carnforth (New) on 08/08/1962
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 10/08/1968
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 03/01/1970
CL   on 24/07/1988
   Withdrawn on 01/05/2004

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
08/08/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number D4141
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Carnforth (24L)
   
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
03/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
06/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08911 (Tops)    
24/07/1988 Allocation      
01/05/2004 Withdrawn Condemned as 08911    

prev prev