Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D435 30/09/1968  
TOPS (Tops) 50035 01/01/1973  

Names Carried
Name Date From
Ark Royal 17/01/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
5030/09/1968
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 30/09/1968 to Stoke Division (D05)
Withdrawn 01/08/1990
Withdrawal Reason Main generator
Time in Service 21 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D05 Stoke Division (New) on 30/09/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 10/01/1976
LA Laira 2w/e 11/12/1976
   Withdrawn on 01/08/1990

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1968 To Service To service as British Railways Number 435
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Stoke Division (D05)
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50035    
10/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
11/12/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
17/01/1978 Naming Named 'Ark Royal' at Plymouth Station    
01/08/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 50035    

prev prev