Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 37 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5594 Week
» 16739 Month
» 116524 Year
» 1781900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5185 22/05/1963  
TOPS (Tops) 25035 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 25
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
25/122/05/1963
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 22/05/1963 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawn 15/03/1987
Time in Service 23 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
18A Toton (New) on 22/05/1963
15A Leicester Midland w/e 04/01/1964
16A Toton w/e 23/05/1964
14B Cricklewood West w/e 26/09/1964
ML Line Power Controller, Derby on 16/01/1965
D16 Nottingham Division on 17/06/1968
D01 London Division w/e 12/07/1969
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 15/07/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 07/10/1972
HA Haymarket 2w/e 15/02/1975
   Withdrawn on 15/03/1987

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
22/05/1963 Power Unit VA711    


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
22/05/1963 To Service To service as British Railways Number 5185
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
04/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
12/07/1969 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
15/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 25035    
15/02/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HA)    
15/03/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 25035    

prev prev