Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5300 30/07/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 26007 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
26/030/07/1958
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
To Service 30/07/1958 to Hornsey (34B)
Withdrawn 04/10/1993
Time in Service 35 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) on 30/07/1958
64B Haymarket w/e 23/04/1960
ED Eastfield on 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn on 04/10/1993

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
16/09/1962 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/07/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 5300
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26007    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
04/10/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 26007    

prev