Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 50 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1887 Week
» 13032 Month
» 112817 Year
» 1778193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5403 17/07/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 27122 01/01/1973  
TOPS (27/2) 27204 19/04/1975  
TOPS (27/0) 27058 05/03/1986  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 27
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2717/07/1962
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 17/07/1962 to Cricklewood East (14A)
Withdrawn 01/05/1986
Time in Service 23 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 08/1987
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
14A Cricklewood East (New) on 17/07/1962
31B March w/e 31/08/1963
14B Cricklewood West w/e 09/11/1963
D14 London (Midland) on 16/01/1965
D01 London Division on 17/06/1968
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 20/07/1968
65A Eastfield w/e 01/03/1969
64B Haymarket 4w/e 26/12/1970
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1986

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
08/1971   Dual Braked        
03/1980   ETH equipment isolated        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
17/07/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number 5403
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A)
   
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
01/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
26/12/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
08/1971 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 27122    
19/04/1975 Renumbered Renumbered to 27204    
03/1980 Modification Modification: ETH equipment isolated    
05/03/1986 Renumbered Renumbered to 27058    
01/05/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 27058    
08/1987 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev