Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 188 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3220 Week
» 21272 Month
» 254192 Year
» 1919568 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5812 31/08/1961  
TOPS (31/4) 31413 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/231/08/1961
31/106/1967
31/403/1974
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 313
To Service 31/08/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Withdrawn 01/05/1997
Time in Service 35 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys
Cut Up 01/1998
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) on 31/08/1961
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 23/04/1966
41C Wath w/e 06/08/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 11/05/1968
82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 16/10/1971
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1997

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
06/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31        
04/1972   Dual AWS Fitted        
03/1974   Dual Braked        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
31/08/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 5812
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 313
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41f)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
06/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
04/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
03/1974 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31413    
01/05/1997 Withdrawn Condemned as 31413    
01/1998 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev