Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 237 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3269 Week
» 21321 Month
» 254241 Year
» 1919617 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6353 12/07/1962  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 22
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
22 (Production)12/07/1962
Wheels B-B
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L97
Works Number 27926
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
Multiple Fitting White Diamond
To Service 12/07/1962 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawn 23/09/1968 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Time in Service 6 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 07/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) on 12/07/1962
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 06/10/1962
81A Old Oak Common w/e 15/11/1964
   Withdrawn on 23/09/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
12/07/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number 6353
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27926
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
15/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
23/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 6353 from Old Oak Common (81A)    
07/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev