Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 741 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4856 Week
» 12971 Month
» 140414 Year
» 1805790 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6789 18/01/1963  
TOPS (37/0) 37089 02/1974  
TOPS (37/7) 37708 1985  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3718/01/1963
37/7 v11985
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Clayton RO2500/03
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Split Headcode Boxes
Nose end Gangway
To Service 18/01/1963 to Gateshead (52A)
Withdrawn 01/10/2002
Time in Service 39 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/03/2008
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) on 18/01/1963
50A York (North) 4w/e 16/07/1966
50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 25/02/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 11/10/1969
IM Immingham 4w/e 06/10/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 16/03/1974
   Withdrawn on 01/10/2002

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
08/1969   Dual Braked        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
18/01/1963 To Service To service as British Railways Number 6789
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
08/1969 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 37089    
16/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
1985 Renumbered Renumbered to 37708    
01/10/2002 Withdrawn Condemned as 37708    
01/03/2008 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev