Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6894 16/03/1964  
TOPS (37/0) 37194 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3716/03/1964
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 16/03/1964 to Landore (87E)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) on 16/03/1964
86A Cardiff Canton 10w/e 28/08/1966
87E Landore q/e 15/01/1967
52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/03/1967
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 4w/e 25/03/1967
52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/03/1967
51L Thornaby w/e 31/01/1970

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
09/1969   Dual Braked        

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
21/01/1970 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation Freight working  


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/03/1964 To Service To service as British Railways Number 6894
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
28/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
15/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
09/1969 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
31/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 37194    

prev prev