Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4812 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18855 Week
» 83809 Month
» 286473 Year
» 3313326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7001 |
03/07/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3040 |
Works Number |
7895 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4616 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
03/07/1961 to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
Withdrawn |
16/03/1974 off Old Oak Common (OC) |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 07/1975 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Information |
Some sources quote 11th March, 1974 as the withdrawal date |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over green with light green skirting, white window surrounds |
03/07/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/03/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7001 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7895 Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7001 from Old Oak Common (oc) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|