Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1079 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18882 Week
» 71898 Month
» 191425 Year
» 3218278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7044 |
18/08/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
18/08/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7044 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7938 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/05/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7044 from Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|