Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1185 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18988 Week
» 72004 Month
» 191531 Year
» 3218384 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7054 |
16/11/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
16/11/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 02/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7054 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7958 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/05/1972 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/09/1972 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7054 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|