Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4137 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17543 Week
» 70559 Month
» 190086 Year
» 3216939 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7071 |
11/03/1963 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
11/03/1963 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7071 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7975 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7071 from Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
09/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|