Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 214 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3246 Week
» 21298 Month
» 254218 Year
» 1919594 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7074 26/03/1963  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 35
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3526/03/1963
Wheels B-B
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number BP3039
Works Number 7978
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 3
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
To Service 26/03/1963 to Bristol Bath Road (82A)
Withdrawn 30/12/1972
Time in Service 9 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 08/1975
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82A Bristol Bath Road (New) on 26/03/1963
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 13/06/1965
84A Laira 4w/e 11/07/1965
83A Newton Abbot 7w/e 19/06/1966
86A Cardiff Canton 10w/e 28/08/1966
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 09/10/1971
   Withdrawn on 30/12/1972


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
26/03/1963 To Service To service as British Railways Number 7074
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7978
Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)
   
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
19/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
28/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
30/12/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as 7074    
08/1975 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev