Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7083 |
05/06/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3039 |
Works Number |
7987 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
05/06/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
8 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
05/06/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7083 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7987 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7083 |
|
|
09/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|