Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17918 Week
» 70934 Month
» 190461 Year
» 3217314 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7086 |
20/07/1963 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
20/07/1963 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7086 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7990 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7086 from Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|