Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 643 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14049 Week
» 67065 Month
» 186592 Year
» 3213445 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7625 |
30/07/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25275 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/07/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/02/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1975 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/07/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
10/1975 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/07/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7625 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8035 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25275 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
18/04/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25275 |
|
|
10/08/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|