Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17162 Week
» 70178 Month
» 189705 Year
» 3216558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7633 |
30/10/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25283 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (25/9) |
25904 |
12/11/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
30/10/1965 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 4 mths , -1 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/10/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7633 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25283 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/11/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25904 |
|
|
01/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25904 |
|
|