Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3935 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17341 Week
» 70357 Month
» 189884 Year
» 3216737 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7645 |
15/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25295 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
15/03/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/03/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7645 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
27/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25295 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/06/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25295 |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|