Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 310 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18113 Week
» 71129 Month
» 190656 Year
» 3217509 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7649 |
15/04/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25299 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
15/04/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/11/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/04/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
24/11/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7649 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
24/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25299 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25299 from Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
05/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|