Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17417 Week
» 70433 Month
» 189960 Year
» 3216813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7653 |
24/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25303 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
24/06/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/08/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/06/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
28/08/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
10/1974 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7653 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
28/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25303 |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
19/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25303 |
|
|
05/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|