Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 663 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 663 Week
» 19564 Month
» 19564 Year
» 1684940 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8042 11/11/1959  
TOPS (20/0) 20042 01/01/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20312 14/09/1998  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2011/11/1959
20/3 (DRS)14/09/1998
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 11/11/1959 to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) on 11/11/1959
1D Devons Road (Bow) w/e 14/11/1959
1A Willesden w/e 20/07/1963
2F Bescot w/e 12/03/1966
D02 Birmingham Division on 18/04/1966
D01 London Division w/e 09/07/1966
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 01/10/1966
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 25/01/1969


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
11/11/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8042
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
12/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
09/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20042 (20/0)    
14/09/1998 Renumbered Renumbered to 20312 (20/3 (RFS))    

prev prev