Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 532 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1704 Week
» 20605 Month
» 20605 Year
» 1685981 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8047 18/12/1959  
TOPS (20/0) 20047 01/01/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20301 15/12/1995  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2018/12/1959
20/3 (DRS)15/12/1995
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 18/12/1959 to Hornsey (34B)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) on 18/12/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
52A Gateshead (on loan) w/e 09/09/1967
52A Gateshead (loan made permanent) m/e 30/09/1967
D16 Nottingham Division (on loan) w/e 18/11/1967
D16 Nottingham Division (loan made permanent) m/e 31/12/1967


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
18/12/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8047
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/09/1967 Allocation Loaned to Gateshead (52A) from Gateshead (52A)    
18/11/1967 Allocation Loaned to Nottingham Division (D16) from Nottingham Division (D16)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20047 (20/0)    
15/12/1995 Renumbered Renumbered to 20301 (20/3 (RFS))    

prev prev