Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 545 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 545 Week
» 18597 Month
» 251517 Year
» 1916893 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8057 01/05/1961  
TOPS (20/0) 20057 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2001/05/1961
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 01/05/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Withdrawn 10/1994
Time in Service 33 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) on 01/05/1961
41A Tinsley on 26/04/1964
40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 11/03/1967
40B Immingham w/e 07/10/1967
30A Stratford w/e 10/08/1968
41A Tinsley w/e 11/10/1969
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1994


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
01/05/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 8057
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
26/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20057    
10/1994 Withdrawn Condemned as 20057    

prev prev