Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 562 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1734 Week
» 20635 Month
» 20635 Year
» 1686011 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8075 26/07/1961  
TOPS (20/0) 20075 01/01/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20308 26/03/1998  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2026/07/1961
20/3 (DRS)26/03/1998
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 2981/8233
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 26/07/1961 to Eastfield (65A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
65A Eastfield (New) on 26/07/1961
62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 31/12/1966
66A Polmadie 4w/e 25/03/1967
65A Eastfield 4w/e 25/01/1969
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 05/07/1969


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
26/07/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8075
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2981
Allocated to Eastfield (65A)
   
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
05/07/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20075 (20/0)    
26/03/1998 Renumbered Renumbered to 20308 (20/3 (RFS))    

prev prev