Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 63 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4978 Week
» 16215 Month
» 249135 Year
» 1914511 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8084 12/09/1961  
TOPS (20/0) 20084 01/01/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20302 15/12/1995  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2012/09/1961
20/3 (DRS)15/12/1995
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Works Number 2990/8242
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 12/09/1961 to Eastfield (65A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
65A Eastfield (New) on 12/09/1961
66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961
65A Eastfield 4w/e 21/10/1961
66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/03/1970
65A Eastfield 4w/e 31/10/1970
TO Toton w/e 01/09/1973


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
12/09/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 8084
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2990
Allocated to Eastfield (65A)
   
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
28/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
31/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20084    
01/09/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
15/12/1995 Renumbered Renumbered to 20302    

prev prev