Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 541 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1713 Week
» 20614 Month
» 20614 Year
» 1685990 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8092 10/10/1961  
TOPS (20/0) 20092 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2010/10/1961
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 10/10/1961 to Eastfield (65A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
65A Eastfield (New) on 10/10/1961
66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/01/1968
65A Eastfield 4w/e 28/06/1969
64B Haymarket 4w/e 26/07/1969
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/11/1969
66A Polmadie 4w/e 28/02/1970
65A Eastfield 5w/e 30/05/1970
IM Immingham w/e 12/05/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 02/06/1973


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8092
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Eastfield (65A)
   
27/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
28/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
26/07/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/11/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
28/02/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
30/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20092 (20/0)    
12/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
02/06/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    

prev prev