Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 642 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5113 Week
» 16159 Month
» 16159 Year
» 1681535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8095 26/10/1961  
TOPS (20/0) 20095 01/12/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20305 08/05/1996  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2026/10/1961
20/3 (DRS)08/05/1996
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 26/10/1961 to Eastfield (65A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
65A Eastfield (New) on 26/10/1961
66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/04/1968
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
26/10/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8095
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Eastfield (65A)
   
27/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20095 (20/0)    
08/05/1996 Renumbered Renumbered to 20305 (20/3 (RFS))    

prev prev