Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 30 Online
» 718 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 718 Week
» 19619 Month
» 19619 Year
» 1684995 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8102 01/12/1961  
TOPS (20/0) 20102 01/1974  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20310 07/04/1998  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2001/12/1961
20/3 (DRS)07/04/1998
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 01/12/1961 to Eastfield (65A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
65A Eastfield (New) on 01/12/1961
66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/10/1968
65A Eastfield 5w/e 31/05/1969


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8102
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Eastfield (65A)
   
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
31/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 20102 (20/0)    
07/04/1998 Renumbered Renumbered to 20310 (20/3 (RFS))    

prev prev