Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 602 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 5266 Month
» 132709 Year
» 1798085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8118 08/03/1962  
TOPS (20/0) 20118 10/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2008/03/1962
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 08/03/1962 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawn 03/03/2000
Time in Service 37 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66A Polmadie (New) on 08/03/1962
65A Eastfield 3w/e 29/09/1962
66A Polmadie 4w/e 25/01/1964
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 15/11/1969
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Withdrawn on 03/03/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
12/1975   Dual Braked        

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
08/03/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number 8118
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
15/11/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
10/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 20118    
12/1975 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
03/03/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 20118    

prev prev