Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 65 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4980 Week
» 16217 Month
» 249137 Year
» 1914513 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8127 16/07/1962  
TOPS (20/0) 20127 01/01/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20303 12/01/1996  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2016/07/1962
20/3 (DRS)12/01/1996
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 16/07/1962 to Polmadie (66A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66A Polmadie (New) on 16/07/1962
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
IM Immingham w/e 12/05/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 02/06/1973


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/07/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number 8127
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20127    
12/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
02/06/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
12/01/1996 Renumbered Renumbered to 20303    

prev prev