Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 27 Week
» 18079 Month
» 250999 Year
» 1916375 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8132 05/03/1966  
TOPS (20/0) 20132 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2005/03/1966
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 05/03/1966 to Tinsley (41A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Tinsley (New) on 05/03/1966
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 18/06/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 31/03/1973


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
05/03/1966 To Service To service as British Railways Number 8132
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Tinsley (41A)
   
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20132    
31/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    

prev prev