Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 647 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7208 Week
» 28110 Month
» 28110 Year
» 1249675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8188 21/01/1967
TOPS (Tops) 20188 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/01/1967
Withdrawn 01/01/1990
Time in Service 22 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D16 Nottingham Division (New) 21/01/1967
   Withdrawn 01/01/1990

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/01/1967 To Service To service as D8188
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16)
   
06/02/1972 Sightings Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed RO 4/1972 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20188    
01/01/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 20188    

prev prev