Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 446 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24077 Week
» 89031 Month
» 291695 Year
» 3318548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8507 |
30/10/1962 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8507 Built at Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
25/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8507 from Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |
|
|