Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 50 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17853 Week
» 70869 Month
» 190396 Year
» 3217249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8536 |
29/08/1963 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/08/1963 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8536 Built at Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8536 from Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |
|
|