Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 891 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14297 Week
» 67313 Month
» 186840 Year
» 3213693 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8594 |
03/07/1964 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/11/1970 |
Severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8594 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
21/09/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8594 |
|
|
03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|