Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 392 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18195 Week
» 71211 Month
» 190738 Year
» 3217591 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8602 |
09/09/1964 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/09/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8602 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8019 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8602 |
|
|
04/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|