Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 55 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2981 Week
» 4719 Month
» 132162 Year
» 1797538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9529 26/01/1965  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 14
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1426/01/1965
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 26/01/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A)
Withdrawn 01/04/1968 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Time in Service 3 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) on 26/01/1965
87E Landore 5w/e 16/05/1965
50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/05/1967
91E To Eastern Region m/e 31/05/1967
   Stored m/e 31/05/1967
   Withdrawn on 01/04/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
26/01/1965 To Service To service as British Railways Number 9529
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
31/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
31/05/1967 To Store To Store    
01/04/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 9529 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    

prev prev