Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 558 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4240 Week
» 10948 Month
» 163901 Year
» 1829277 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
SR CC2 09/1945
Pre TOPS 20002 03/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class 70
Wheels C-C
Builder Ashford Works
To Service 09/1945
Withdrawn 12/1968
Time in Service 23 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys
Cut Up 09/1969
Cut At Cashmore's Newport
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) m/e 09/1945
BTN Brighton on 01/01/1948
73A Stewarts Lane 1w/e 11/03/1959
75A Brighton 4w/e 22/08/1966
   Withdrawn on 12/1968


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1945 To Service To service as CC2
Built at Ashford Works
   
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to E20002    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
22/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 20002    
31/07/1969 Sightings Moved from Brighton to Newport, South Wales for scrapping at Cashmore's - Moved as an 'out of gauge' freight RO489 11/69  
13/08/1969 Sightings Noted at J Cashmore's scrapyard, Newport: For scrap - Intact RO489 11/69 Link
09/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev