Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 2404 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15810 Week
» 68826 Month
» 188353 Year
» 3215206 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
LNER (Orig) (Orig) |
6701 |
19/02/1941 |
LNER (1946) (1946) |
6000 |
06/1946 |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
26000 |
19/04/1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
19/02/1941 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/03/1970 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
19/02/1941 |
vo |
Vacuum braked, No heat |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Works |
Entry |
Departure |
Durn |
Level of Work |
Mileage |
Gorton Works |
|
12/05/1956 |
|
Heavy General |
|
Gorton Works |
|
11/10/1956 |
|
Light Casual |
49034 |
Gorton Works |
|
08/10/1958 |
|
Light Casual |
|
Gorton Works |
|
30/10/1959 |
|
Light Casual |
84828 |
Gorton Works |
|
08/09/1960 |
|
Non Classified |
116042 |
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1958 |
16,283 |
|
|
|
|
|
125 |
125 |
9 |
|
41 |
|
|
175 |
1959 |
36,054 |
|
|
|
|
|
39 |
39 |
4 |
|
4 |
|
|
47 |
1960 |
35,781 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
8 |
|
1 |
|
|
9 |
1961 |
24,894 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/02/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway number E6701 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6000 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26000 |
|
|
12/05/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy General) - Dep: 12/05/1956. Stopped on 00/00/0000 |
|
|
11/10/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 11/10/1956. Stopped on 24/05/1956 |
|
|
08/10/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 08/10/1958. Stopped on 15/05/1958 |
|
|
30/10/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 30/10/1959. Stopped on 15/09/1959 |
|
|
08/09/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Gorton Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 08/09/1960. Stopped on 08/09/1960 |
|
|
22/03/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26000 from Reddish (9C) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|