Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2713 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16119 Week
» 69135 Month
» 188662 Year
» 3215515 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
26037 |
16/02/1952 |
TOPS (Tops) |
76037 |
23/03/1972 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
76 |
Wheels |
Bo+Bo |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
16/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
20/07/1981 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1983 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry Leicester |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/01/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1976 |
|
Clear Call equipment fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
25/01/1977 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
16/02/1952 |
vo |
Vacuum braked, No heat |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
ao |
Air braked, No heat |
|
|
25/01/1977 |
ao |
Air braked, No heat |
Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 26037 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
28/11/1971 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Reddish (9C) |
|
|
23/03/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76037 |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Clear Call equipment fitted |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
25/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
20/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76037 |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|