Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
26044 |
19/06/1952 |
TOPS (Tops) |
76044 |
09/03/1972 |
TOPS (AB/MU) |
76031 |
18/03/1976 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
19/06/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/07/1981 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/03/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/03/1976 |
|
Clear Call equipment fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/03/1976 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/03/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
19/06/1952 |
vo |
Vacuum braked, No heat |
|
|
18/03/1976 |
ao |
Air braked, No heat |
Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 26044 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
09/03/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76044 |
|
|
18/03/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
18/03/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Clear Call equipment fitted |
|
|
18/03/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
18/03/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
18/03/1976 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76031 |
|
|
20/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76031 |
|
|
02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: Sheffield |
|
|