Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3371 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16777 Week
» 69793 Month
» 189320 Year
» 3216173 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
26048 |
18/10/1952 |
TOPS (Tops) |
76048 |
27/05/1972 |
TOPS (AB/MU) |
76039 |
28/10/1976 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
76 |
Wheels |
Bo+Bo |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
18/10/1952 |
Withdrawn |
20/07/1981 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1983 |
Cut At |
C F Booth Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
18/10/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/07/1981 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/10/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
17/10/1977 |
|
Clear Call equipment fitted |
|
|
|
|
17/10/1977 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
17/10/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
18/10/1952 |
vb |
Vacuum braked, Steam heat |
|
|
17/10/1977 |
ab |
Air braked, Steam heat |
Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 26048 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76048 |
|
|
28/10/1976 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 76039 |
|
|
17/10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
17/10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Clear Call equipment fitted |
|
|
17/10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
17/10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
20/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76039 |
|
|
06/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|