Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 553 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18356 Week
» 71372 Month
» 190899 Year
» 3217752 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3066 |
17/04/1962 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85011 |
19/10/1974 |
TOPS (85/1) |
85114 |
11/10/1990 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/07/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
17/04/1962 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
03/07/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3066 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
03/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
19/10/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85011 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
11/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85114 |
|
|
01/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85114 |
|
|
01/02/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|