Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 174 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17977 Week
» 70993 Month
» 190520 Year
» 3217373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3074 |
05/12/1962 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85019 |
28/09/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
05/12/1962 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3074 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85019 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
01/12/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85019 |
|
|
30/11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|