Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 452 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14495 Week
» 79449 Month
» 282113 Year
» 3308966 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3078 |
23/03/1963 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85023 |
06/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
20/01/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
23/03/1963 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
20/01/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3078 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
20/01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85023 |
|
|
02/04/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85023 |
|
|
01/11/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|