Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1355 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14761 Week
» 67777 Month
» 187304 Year
» 3214157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3080 |
30/03/1963 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85025 |
08/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/05/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
30/03/1963 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
16/05/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3080 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
16/05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
08/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85025 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
08/01/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85025 |
|
|
30/11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|