Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1140 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18943 Week
» 71959 Month
» 191486 Year
» 3218339 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3082 |
08/06/1963 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85027 |
07/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
08/06/1963 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
24/11/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3082 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
24/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85027 |
|
|
29/05/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85027 |
|
|
23/03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|