Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15048 Week
» 68064 Month
» 187591 Year
» 3214444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3093 |
01/11/1963 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85038 |
05/01/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
01/11/1963 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
02/1971 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3093 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85038 |
|
|
02/01/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85038 |
|
|
24/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|