Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3200 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16606 Week
» 69622 Month
» 189149 Year
» 3216002 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3122 |
27/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86012 |
29/06/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86312 |
31/12/1979 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86412 |
10/10/1985 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86612 |
19/10/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
27/09/1965 |
Status |
In Service |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
27/09/1965 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
27/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3122 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
29/06/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86012 |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86312 |
|
|
10/10/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86412 |
|
|
19/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86612 |
|
|